Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Langton

Deceased

Bishop of Saint David’s, Wales


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Jan 1447AppointedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
7 May 1447Ordained BishopBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain
22 May 1447DiedBishop of Saint David’s, Wales, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Langton:
Bishop John Langton (died ) Bishop of Saint David’s

  • a bishop for .0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 297
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 190
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013