Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino della Croce, B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1502¹Born
7 Jun 154644.4AppointedBishop of Casale Monferrato, Italy
27 Apr 154745.3AppointedBishop of Asti, Italy
24 Sep 154846.7AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
7 Apr 155957.2ResignedBishop of Como, Italy
15 Aug 156866.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Como, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino della Croce (VIAF: 314889508)
Bishop Bernardino della Croce B. (born 1502, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Como

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRiva San Vitale
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155, and Page 121
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 182
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 29*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast