Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bartolomeo Albani

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jun 1546AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
20 Apr 1547Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
22 Oct 1552AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
May 1558³DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Albani
Archbishop Bartolomeo Albani (died May 1558) Archbishop of Sorrento

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 305, and Page 306
  • ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1547, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast