Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Luis Cotoner

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1613BornPalma de Mallora, Spain
23 Jun 166450.5AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
28 Sep 167157.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Mallorca, Spain
18 Jan 168470.1DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Luis Cotoner:
Archbishop Bernardo Luis Cotoner (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 91
  • bp/bd: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 199, Number 1,247

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 4 Nov 2013