Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Aguilar, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cebu


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1616²BornMedina de Río Seco, Spain
16 Nov 167660.9AppointedBishop of Cebu, Philippines
14 Nov 167761.9Ordained BishopBishop of Cebu, Philippines
1 Oct 169276.8DiedBishop of Cebu, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Diego de Aguilar:
Bishop Diego de Aguilar O.P. (died ) Bishop of Cebu

  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 217, Number 1,348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013