Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Aguiar

Deceased

Bishop of Ceuta, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1693Born
27 Jan 173844.2AppointedBishop of Ceuta, Spain
20 Apr 173844.4Ordained BishopBishop of Ceuta, Spain
14 Feb 174349.2DiedBishop of Ceuta, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Aguiar
Bishop Miguel Aguiar (born , died ) Bishop of Ceuta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMálaga

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 55, Number 242
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1738, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 376

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast