Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo de Ziga

Deceased

Bishop of Jan, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1415AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
2 Oct 1422AppointedBishop of Jan, Spain
27 Jun 1456DiedBishop of Jan, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo de Ziga
Bishop Gonzalo de Ziga (died ) Bishop of Jan

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 402, and Page 263
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 159

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast