Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Zumárraga, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of México, Federal District


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1468²Born
20 Aug 153062.6AppointedBishop of México, Federal District
27 Apr 153365.3Ordained BishopBishop of México, Federal District
28 Dec 153365.9InstalledBishop of México, Federal District
12 Feb 154678.1AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
3 Jun 154880.4DiedArchbishop of México, Federal District

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Zumárraga (VIAF: 64826962)
Archbishop Juan de Zumárraga O.F.M. (born 1468, died ) Archbishop of México

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTabira de Durango, Diocese of Calahorra y La Calzada, Spain
Ordained BishopSan Francisco, Convent, Valladolid, Archdiocese of Valladolid, Spain
Death PlaceMexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 44, Number 222
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 243
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1533, Number 10
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 50, Number 3,402
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast