Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Pietro Romualdo Maria Zilianti, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1901Born
15 Mar 192422.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
24 Sep 194645.4SelectedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
10 May 194746.0ConfirmedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
197068.7ResignedAbbot of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy
15 Dec 197574.6DiedAbbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Romualdo Maria Zilianti (VIAF: 259259214)
Abbot Pietro Romualdo Maria Zilianti O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Monte Oliveto Maggiore

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbadia San Salvatore, Archdiocese of Siena

  • a priest for 51.7 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Apr 2021

Quantcast