Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Diego de Zambrana de Villalobos y Cordero

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1577²Born
1608²31.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 163356.2AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
1636²59.0Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
15 Mar 163861.2InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
12 Dec 165275.9DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile
17 Mar 165376.2AppointedBishop of Santiago de Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Diego de Zambrana de Villalobos y Cordero
Bishop Diego de Zambrana de Villalobos y Cordero (born 1577, died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMérida, Spain
Ordained BishopLa Paz, Diocese of La Paz, Bolivia

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,027
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 158, and Page 206
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 158, Number 1,000
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1636, Number 44
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 65, Number 5,046

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast