Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Munio Zamora, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Palencia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1237¹Born
1285²48.0AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
12 Apr 129154.2CeasedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Feb 129457.0AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
7 Mar 129457.1Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
11 Jul 129659.5ResignedBishop of Palencia, Spain
19 Apr 130063.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Palencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Munio Zamora (VIAF: 47607853)
Bishop Munio Zamora O.P. (born 1237, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora
Ordained BishopAlcala de Henares
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 386
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Espaņol, Volume 1,500, Page 298, Number 114
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,953
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,697

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast