Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Miguel Cardinal de Zalba

Deceased

Administrator of Pamplona, Spain

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1374¹Born
9 May 140430.3AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giorgio in Velabro
9 May 140430.3Elevated to Cardinal
22 May 140430.3AppointedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain
24 Aug 140632.6DiedAdministrator of Pamplona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel de Zalba
Miguel Cardinal de Zalba (born 1374, died ) Administrator of Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona, Diocese of Pamplona
Death PlaceMonaco, Diocese of Nice, France
Buried Place (Original)S. Francesco, Church, Nice, Diocese of Nice, France
Buried Place (Current)Saint-Marie de Bon Pas, Church, Avignon

  • a cardinal for 2.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 May 1404
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 387

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 Apr 2021

Quantcast