Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Wishart

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
1272¹AppointedBishop of Glasgow, Scotland, Great Britain
15 May 1273AppointedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
15 Oct 1273Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain
28 May 1279DiedBishop of Saint Andrews, Scotland, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Wishart
Bishop William Wishart (died ) Bishop of Saint Andrews

EventPlace
Ordained BishopScone
Death PlaceMerbotill

  • a bishop for 5.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 264, and Page 89
  • b: Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Page 240, and Page 236
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 94, Number 7,950

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 22 Nov 2020

Quantcast