Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Wickwane

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Jun 1279SelectedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
17 Sep 1279Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
26 Aug 1285DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Wickwane
Archbishop William Wickwane (died ) Archbishop of York

EventPlace
Ordained BishopViterbo, Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 103
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 65
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Aug 2021

Quantcast