Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Jan Kazimierz Waza, S.J. †

Deceased

Member of Society of Jesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1609Born
1643²33.6EnteredMember of Society of Jesus
28 May 164637.0Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 164839.1ResignedCardinal-Priest
16 Dec 167263.5Died

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Kazimierz Waza
(Layman) Jan Kazimierz Waza S.J. (born , died )

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKraków, Diocese of Kraków, Poland
Death PlaceSaint-Martin, Abbey, Nevers, Diocese of Nevers, France
Buried Place (Original)Saint-Germain-des-Prés, Abbey, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Buried Place (Current)Crypt, Royal Basilica, Wawel, Castle, Kraków, Diocese of Kraków, Poland

  • a cardinal for 2.1 years (Resigned)

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 May 1646

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast