Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Richard Walsh

Deceased

Bishop of Cork, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1697²Born
13 Dec 174750.9SelectedBishop of Cork, Ireland
10 Jan 174851.0ConfirmedBishop of Cork, Ireland
17 Jan 176366.0DiedBishop of Cork, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Richard Walsh
Bishop Richard Walsh (born 1697, died ) Bishop of Cork

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGortroe parish near Lombardstown
Death PlaceMallow Lane
Buried Place (Original)Old of St. Ann's Shandon, Cemetery

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 182
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,477
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1748, Number 40
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast