Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop St. Vizelin

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Oldenburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1090¹Born
1149²59.0AppointedBishop of Oldenburg, Germany
25 Sep 114959.7Ordained BishopBishop of Oldenburg, Germany
12 Dec 115464.9DiedBishop of Oldenburg, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Vizelin (VIAF: 48818419)
Bishop St. Vizelin (born 1090, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Oldenburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHameln
Ordained BishopHarsefeld

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: ATh, 27 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 19,990

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast