Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Onofrio Visdomini, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Mar 1384AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
15 May 1390AppointedBishop of Firenze, Italy
13 Dec 1400AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
1401¹ResignedBishop of Comacchio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Onofrio Visdomini
Bishop Onofrio Visdomini O.E.S.A. , Bishop Emeritus of Comacchio

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 536, and Page 250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 199

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast