Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Visconti, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Catanzaro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Aug 1596Born
23 Apr 165760.7AppointedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
6 May 165760.7Ordained BishopBishop of Catanzaro, Italy
26 Jan 166467.4DiedBishop of Catanzaro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Visconti
Bishop Filippo Visconti O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Catanzaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSt. Augustin, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 141
  • bd/d/ob/c2: CB, 20 Jul 2014
  • bd/d/ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1657, Number 9
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Number 5,273
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast