Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Vienne

Deceased

Bishop of Basel, Switzerland


Events

DateEventTitle
8 Jun 1355AppointedArchbishop of Besanšon, France
15 Nov 1361AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Metz, France
13 Aug 1365AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Basel, Switzerland
7 Oct 1382DiedBishop of Basel, Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Jean de Vienne
Archbishop Jean de Vienne (died ) Bishop of Basel

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 338, and Page 129
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 130, and Page 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Mar 2021

Quantcast