Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Visconti, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aegina Insula, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1388AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
1 Feb 1390AppointedBishop of Cremona, Italy
21 Oct 1390AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
28 Mar 1397AppointedBishop of Aegina Insula, Greece
1400¹ResignedBishop of Aegina Insula, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Visconti
Bishop Tommaso Visconti O.E.S.A. , Bishop Emeritus of Aegina Insula

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 214, and Page 147
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 9 Aug 2021

Quantcast