Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio de Vetulis (Vecchi)

Deceased

Bishop of Fermo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Dec 1374AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
1386¹ResignedBishop of Fermo, Italy
2 Feb 1390AppointedBishop of Fermo, Italy
21 Jul 1405DiedBishop of Fermo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antonio de Vetulis (Vecchi)
Bishop Antonio de Vetulis (Vecchi) (died ) Bishop of Fermo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 249, and Page 250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 31 Jul 2021

Quantcast