Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal Veterani

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1703Born
26 Sep 176662.9Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 176663.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano
12 Aug 177672.8DiedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Veterani
Benedetto Cardinal Veterani (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Santi Cosma e Damiano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUrbino, Italy

  • a cardinal for 9.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Sep 1766

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast