Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father P. Jean Van der Heijden (Heyden), S.V.D. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Apr 1900Born
1 Feb 193130.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
195756.6AppointedPrefect of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
196362.6ResignedPrefect of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
6 Apr 198887.9DiedPrefect Emeritus of Kenge, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for P. Jean Van der Heijden (Heyden)
Father P. Jean Van der Heijden (Heyden) S.V.D. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Kenge

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCuijk

  • a priest for 57.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 Sep 2021

Quantcast