Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guglielmo Vasco, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Jul 1357AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
24 Nov 1371AppointedBishop of Siena, Italy
2 Oct 1377AppointedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
1386²RemovedBishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
20 Jan 1388AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guglielmo Vasco
Archbishop Guglielmo Vasco O.F.M. , Archbishop Emeritus of Napoli {Naples}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 282, and Page 446
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 199, and Page 360

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Jul 2021

Quantcast