Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Fernando Vargas de Toledo, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Feb 1353AppointedBishop of Badajoz, Spain
25 Oct 1354AppointedBishop of Osma, Spain
18 Jun 1361AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
27 Dec 1366DiedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Fernando Vargas de Toledo
Archbishop Alfonso Fernando Vargas de Toledo O.E.S.A. (died ) Archbishop of Sevilla {Seville}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 383, and Page 278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 22 Apr 2021

Quantcast