Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pavol Vagyon

Deceased

Bishop of the Titular See


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1808Born
5 Apr 183123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Nitra, Slovakia
186859.7AppointedBishop of the Titular See
5 Apr 187163.0DiedBishop of the Titular See

MicroData Summary for Pavol Vagyon
Bishop Pavol Vagyon (born , died ) Bishop of Titular See

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZlatovce, Slovakia

  • a priest for 40.0 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast