Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Tyrrell (Tyrell), O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Meath, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1627¹Born
13 May 167649.3AppointedBishop of Clogher, Ireland
14 Jun 167649.4Ordained BishopBishop of Clogher, Ireland
21 Mar 167851.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kilmore, Ireland
8 Jun 168861.4SelectedBishop of Meath, Ireland
24 Jan 168962.0ConfirmedBishop of Meath, Ireland
Oct 1692²65.7DiedBishop of Meath, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick Tyrrell (Tyrell)
Bishop Patrick Tyrrell (Tyrell) O.F.M. (born 1627, died Oct 1692) Bishop of Meath

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFertullagh, Co. Westmeath
Death PlaceLimerick, Diocese of Limerick

  • a bishop for 16.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 162, and Page 232
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 263
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 42
  • b: The Irish Catholic Episcopal Corps, 1657-1829, Volume 2, Page 126

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast