Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tylo (Dietrich) Stobenhain, O.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Feb 1379Ordained BishopBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland
2 Jan 1386DiedBishop of Samland (Sambia), Poland

MicroData Summary for Tylo (Dietrich) Stobenhain
Bishop Tylo (Dietrich) Stobenhain O.T. (died ) Bishop of Samland (Sambia)

  • a bishop for 6.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 433
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Number 10,215
  • ob/c2: ATh, 27 Mar 2019
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,030

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast