Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Siegfried-Ceslas George Tunmer, O.P. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Mossul, Iraq


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1900Born
29 Jan 193736.8AppointedSuperior of Mossul, Iraq
1953²52.7ResignedSuperior of Mossul, Iraq
31 May 197575.1DiedSuperior Emeritus of Mossul, Iraq

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Siegfried-Ceslas George Tunmer (VIAF: 88712388)
Father Siegfried-Ceslas George Tunmer O.P. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Mossul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis 16e Arrondissement, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Death PlaceParis 14e Arrondissement, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 9 Mar 2021
  • loc/b/d: CL, 11 Mar 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 11 Mar 2021

Quantcast