Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacinto Trucchi, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Sep 1623³Born
21 Dec 164724.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Jun 166945.7AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
7 Jul 169874.8DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacinto Trucchi
Bishop Giacinto Trucchi O.P. (born Sep 1623, died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSavigliano

  • a priest for 50.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 229
  • b: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1669, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast