Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cesare Trivulzio

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1496¹Born
26 Sep 151923.7AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
18 May 152327.3Ordained BishopBishop of Como, Italy
12 May 153337.3AppointedBishop of Apt, France
1540¹44.0ResignedBishop of Apt, France
1548²52.0DiedBishop of Como, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Cesare Trivulzio
Bishop Cesare Trivulzio (born 1496, died 1548) Bishop of Como

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 24.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 182, and Page 112
  • ob/c2: CB, 15 Nov 2012
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1523, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast