Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicola da Treviso, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Thermopylae, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Apr 1410AppointedArchbishop of Thebae
11 Aug 1410AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Nona (Nin), Croatia
13 Oct 1424AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Thermopylae, Greece

MicroData Summary for Nicola da Treviso
Archbishop Nicola da Treviso O.F.M. , Bishop of Thermopylae

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 370, and Page 483
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 482

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 7 Jul 2021

Quantcast