Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques de Tournon

Deceased

Bishop of Valence and Die, France


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Apr 1531AppointedBishop of Castres, France
8 Apr 1536AppointedBishop of Valence and Die, France
15 Aug 1553DiedBishop of Valence and Die, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques de Tournon
Bishop Jacques de Tournon (died ) Bishop of Valence and Die

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 158, and Page 326
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1531, Number 11*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast