Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillem de Torrelles

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1357AppointedBishop of Huesca, Spain
18 Jun 1361AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
14 Mar 1369AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
16 Feb 1379DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Guillem de Torrelles
Bishop Guillem de Torrelles (died ) Bishop of Tortosa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 128, and Page 223
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 378

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 23 Apr 2021

Quantcast