Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marino de Tocco

Deceased

Bishop of Chieti, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Feb 1407AppointedBishop of Teramo, Italy
1412¹RemovedBishop of Teramo, Italy
6 Jul 1418AppointedBishop of Recanati, Italy
7 Jan 1429AppointedBishop of Chieti, Italy
1438²DiedBishop of Chieti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marino de Tocco
Bishop Marino de Tocco (died 1438) Bishop of Chieti

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 481, and Page 411
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 95
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 249

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 May 2021

Quantcast