Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume de Thurey

Deceased

Archbishop of Lyon, France


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jan 1356AppointedBishop of Autun, France
25 Aug 1358AppointedArchbishop of Lyon, France
12 May 1365DiedArchbishop of Lyon, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Thurey
Archbishop Guillaume de Thurey (died ) Archbishop of Lyon

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 316, and Page 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Mar 2021

Quantcast