Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Janez Tavčar (Tautscher)

Deceased

Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1544²Born
27 Mar 156925.2Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 158036.3AppointedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
15 Aug 158036.6Ordained BishopBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia
24 Aug 159753.6DiedBishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach), Slovenia

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Janez Tavčar (Tautscher) (VIAF: 15588937)
Bishop Janez Tavčar (Tautscher) (born 1544, died ) Bishop of Ljubljana (Laybach; Laibach)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceŐtanjel na Krasu, Patriarchate of Aquileia, Italy
Ordained BishopGorizia, Patriarchate of Aquileia, Italy
Death PlaceGratz, Diocese of Seckau, Austria

  • a priest for 28.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1580, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 64, Number 4,924
  • b/c2: AT, 6 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast