Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Tabari

Deceased

Bishop of Thérouanne, France


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Jan 1384AppointedBishop of Thérouanne, France
19 Mar 1384Ordained BishopBishop of Thérouanne, France
15 Feb 1403DiedBishop of Thérouanne, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Tabari
Bishop Jean Tabari (died ) Bishop of Thérouanne

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLesterps
Death PlaceParis, Diocese of Paris

  • a bishop for 18.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 351
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 9,983

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Feb 2021

Quantcast