Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Suárez de Villegas, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic

Titular Bishop of Memphis

Vicar Apostolic of Ethiopia

Titular See: (Vicar/Ethiopia)


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Nov 1611ProfessedMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
9 Dec 1649AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ethiopia
9 Dec 1649AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
21 Dec 1649Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Memphis
17 Apr 1664DiedVicar Apostolic of Ethiopia

MicroData Summary for Francisco Suárez de Villegas
Bishop Francisco Suárez de Villegas O. Carm. (died ) Vicar Apostolic

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopS. Maria in Transpontine, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 14.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 179, Number 1,114
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 20
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,321

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast