Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaroslav František Ignác von Sternberg (Šternberka)

Deceased

Bishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1641Born
166826.6Ordained PriestPriest of Praha {Prague}, Czech Republic
30 Oct 167534.4SelectedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
22 Jun 167635.0ConfirmedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
23 Aug 167635.2Ordained BishopBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic
12 Apr 170967.8DiedBishop of Litoměřice, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Jaroslav František Ignác von Sternberg (Šternberka)
Bishop Jaroslav František Ignác von Sternberg (Šternberka) (born , died ) Bishop of Litoměřice

EventPlace
Birth PlacePraha
Ordained BishopPassau, Diocese of Passau, Germany

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 32.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 245
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1676, Number 21
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 78, Number 6,304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast