Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicolas Cardinal de Saint Saturnin, O.P. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Titular See: (pseudocardinal)


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1378AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
18 Dec 1378Elevated to Cardinal
26 Mar 1380AppointedAdministrator of Nice, France
1382¹ResignedAdministrator of Nice, France
23 Jul 1382DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicolas de Saint Saturnin
Nicolas Cardinal de Saint Saturnin O.P. (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint Saturnin, Diocese of Clermont, France
Death PlaceAvignon
Buried Place (Original)Dominican, Church, Clermont, Diocese of Clermont, France

  • a cardinal for 3.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, Jul 1378
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 364

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 28 Feb 2021

Quantcast