Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianfrancesco Sormani

Deceased

Bishop of Montefeltro, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1522¹Born
6 Mar 156644.1AppointedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
12 Mar 156644.1Ordained BishopBishop of Montefeltro, Italy
1601²79.0DiedBishop of Montefeltro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gianfrancesco Sormani (VIAF: 44019528)
Bishop Gianfrancesco Sormani (born 1522, died 1601) Bishop of Montefeltro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSanta Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceRimini, Diocese of Rimini
Buried Place (Original)Franciscan, Church, Montemaggio di San Leo, Diocese of Montefeltro

  • a bishop for 34.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 195
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 7*
  • ob/c2+: AT, 1 Feb 2021
  • d: CB, 2 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Feb 2021

Quantcast