Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pierre de Saint Martial

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse, France


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Jan 1357AppointedBishop of Rieux, France
12 Dec 1371AppointedBishop of Carcassonne, France
19 Sep 1391AppointedArchbishop of Toulouse, France
1 Dec 1401DiedArchbishop of Toulouse, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre de Saint Martial
Archbishop Pierre de Saint Martial (died ) Archbishop of Toulouse

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 488, and Page 166
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 421

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 20 Feb 2021

Quantcast