Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo di Santa María

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Burgos, Spain

Titular Archbishop of Philippi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1353¹Born
1394²41.0Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jul 140350.5AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
18 Dec 141562.9AppointedBishop of Burgos, Spain
6 Jul 143582.5ResignedBishop of Burgos, Spain
6 Jul 143582.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippi
29 Aug 143582.6DiedTitular Archbishop of Philippi

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo di Santa María (VIAF: 262636849)
Archbishop Paolo di Santa María (born 1353, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Burgos

EventPlace
Death PlaceBurgos, Diocese of Burgos

  • a priest for 41.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 112, and Page 215
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 151, and Page 168

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 25 Apr 2021

Quantcast