Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Sillani Leoncilli

Deceased

Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 May 1641³Born
24 Mar 168644.8Ordained PriestPriest
13 May 168645.0AppointedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy
1 Aug 169756.2DiedBishop of Civita Castellana e Orte, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Antonio Sillani Leoncilli
Bishop Giuseppe Antonio Sillani Leoncilli (born , died ) Bishop of Civita Castellana e Orte

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpoleto
Death PlaceCivita Castellana, Diocese of Civita Castellana e Orte
Buried Place (Original)San Gratiliano, Chapel, Civita Castellana, Diocese of Civita Castellana e Orte

  • a priest for 11.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 159
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1686, Number 29
  • d/loc: CB, 9 Jun 2019
  • d/loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast