Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Sherwood

Deceased

Bishop of Durham, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1484AppointedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
26 May 1484Ordained BishopBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain
12 Jan 1494DiedBishop of Durham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Sherwood
Bishop John Sherwood (died ) Bishop of Durham

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Onufre, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 292
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 147
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 93
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1484, Number 5
  • ob: CB, 31 Dec 2018
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 58, Number 4,274
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,715

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast