Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrico de Sessa

Deceased

Bishop of Como, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Aug 1357AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
12 Oct 1358AppointedBishop of Ascoli Piceno, Italy
19 Dec 1362AppointedBishop of Brescia, Italy
22 Oct 1369AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
19 Jun 1380³DiedBishop of Como, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrico de Sessa
Bishop Enrico de Sessa (died ) Bishop of Como

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 395, and Page 111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 147, and Page 217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast