Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aimerico Segaudi, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mondovi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Dec 1437AppointedBishop of Belley, France
29 Nov 1438AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
12 Mar 1470DiedBishop of Mondovi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Aimerico Segaudi
Bishop Aimerico Segaudi C.R.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Mondovi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 103, and Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast