Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Aimone de Séchal

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Administrator of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Aug 1385AppointedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
10 Feb 1393AppointedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
7 Aug 1394AppointedAdministrator of Belley, France
26 Apr 1395ResignedAdministrator of Belley, France
17 Sep 1397AppointedAdministrator of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
17 Sep 1397CeasedAdministrator of Saint-Pons-de-Thomières, France
1404²DiedTitular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Aimone de Séchal
Patriarch Aimone de Séchal (died 1404) Titular Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 473, and Page 276
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 406, and Page 131

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 8 Mar 2021

Quantcast